Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/22/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/22/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/22/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/23/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/28/2010