There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To express the sense of Congress that it is the responsibility of Congress to determine the regulatory authority of the Federal Communications Commission with respect to broadband Internet services.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/30/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
07/30/2010Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/2010Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (80)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 08/10/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 08/10/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 08/10/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 08/10/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 08/10/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 08/10/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 08/10/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 08/10/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 08/10/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 08/10/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 08/10/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 08/10/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 08/10/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 08/10/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 08/10/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/15/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/15/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/15/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/15/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/15/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/15/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/15/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 09/15/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/15/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/20/2010
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/29/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/29/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/29/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce07/30/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.311.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.311. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/30/2010)

Declares that: (1) it is Congress's responsibility to determine the regulatory authority of the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) with respect to broadband Internet services; and (2) the FCC should suspend any further action on its proceeding to extend its traditional communications regulatory authority to include such services until Congress delegates such authority to the FCC.