Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 08/10/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/15/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/15/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/20/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/29/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/29/2010