Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 08/10/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 08/10/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 08/10/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 08/10/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 08/10/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 08/10/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 08/10/2010
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/15/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/15/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/15/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/15/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/15/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/15/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/20/2010
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/29/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/29/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/29/2010