There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Supporting the goal of ensuring that all Holocaust survivors in the United States are able to live with dignity, comfort, and security in their remaining years.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
12/01/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 406 - 0 (Roll no. 590).(text: CR 11/30/2010 H7713-7714)
09/29/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/01/2010SenateReceived in the Senate and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
12/01/2010-12:51pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/01/2010-12:51pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 406 - 0 (Roll no. 590). (text: CR 11/30/2010 H7713-7714)
12/01/2010-12:44pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7775)
11/30/2010-6:02pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
11/30/2010-5:39pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 323.
11/30/2010-5:39pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7713-7716)
11/30/2010-5:39pmHouseMrs. McCarthy (NY) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
11/18/2010HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Healthy Families and Communities.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
09/29/2010HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
09/29/2010HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (105)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 09/29/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/15/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/15/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/15/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/15/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 11/15/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 11/15/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/15/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/15/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/15/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/15/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/15/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/15/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/15/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 11/15/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/15/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/15/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/15/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/15/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 11/15/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/15/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/15/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/15/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/17/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/17/2010
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 11/17/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/17/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 11/17/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 11/18/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/18/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/18/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/18/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/18/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/18/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/18/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/29/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 11/29/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/29/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/29/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/29/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 11/29/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/29/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/29/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 11/29/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 11/29/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 11/29/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 11/29/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 11/29/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/29/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/29/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/29/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/29/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 11/29/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 11/29/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 11/29/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 11/29/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/29/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/29/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT-5] 11/29/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/29/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 11/29/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 11/30/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/30/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 11/30/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/30/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/30/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/30/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/30/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/30/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 11/30/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/30/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/30/2010
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 11/30/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/30/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 11/30/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/30/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/30/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/30/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/30/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/30/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/01/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/01/2010

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor09/29/2010 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Healthy Families and Communities11/18/2010 Referred to
Senate Judiciary12/01/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.323.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Con.Res.323. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (12/01/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Supports the goal of ensuring that all Holocaust survivors in the United States are able to live with dignity, comfort, and security in their remaining years.

Applauds the nonprofit organizations and agencies that work tirelessly to honor and assist Holocaust survivors in their communities.

Urges the Administration and the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS), in conjunction with the Administration on Aging (AoA), to provide Holocaust survivors with needed social services through existing programs.

Encourages the AoA to expeditiously develop and implement programs that ensure Holocaust survivors are able to age in place in their communities and avoid institutionalization during their remaining years.