Text: H.Con.Res.331 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/16/2010)


111th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. CON. RES. 331

Expressing the sense of Congress that an appropriate site on Chaplains Hill in Arlington National Cemetery should be provided for a memorial marker to honor the memory of the Jewish chaplains who died while on active duty in the Armed Forces of the United States.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
November 16, 2010

Mr. Weiner submitted the following concurrent resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Veterans’ Affairs


CONCURRENT RESOLUTION

Expressing the sense of Congress that an appropriate site on Chaplains Hill in Arlington National Cemetery should be provided for a memorial marker to honor the memory of the Jewish chaplains who died while on active duty in the Armed Forces of the United States.

Whereas 14 Jewish chaplains have died while on active duty in the Armed Forces of the United States;

Whereas Army Chaplain Rabbi Alexander Goode died on February 3, 1943, when then USS Dorchester was sunk by German torpedoes off the coast of Greenland;

Whereas Chaplain Goode received the Four Chaplains’ Medal for Heroism and the Distinguished Service Cross for his heroic efforts to save the lives of those onboard the Dorchester;

Whereas Army Chaplain Rabbi Irving Tepper was killed in action in France on August 13, 1944;

Whereas Chaplain Tepper also saw combat in Morocco, Tunisia, and Sicily while attached to an infantry combat team in the Ninth Division;

Whereas Army Chaplain Rabbi Louis Werfel died on December 24, 1944, at the young age of 27, in a plane crash while en route to conduct Chanukah services;

Whereas Chaplain Werfel was known as “The Flying Rabbi” because his duties required traveling great distances by plane to serve Army personnel of Jewish faith at outlying posts;

Whereas Army Chaplain Rabbi Meir Engel died at the Naval Hospital in Saigon on December 16, 1964, after faithfully serving his country during WWII, the Korean War, and the Vietnam War;

Whereas Army Chaplain Rabbi Morton Singer died on December 17, 1968, in a plane crash while on a mission in Vietnam to conduct Chanukah services;

Whereas Army Chaplain Rabbi Herman died in service of his faith and his country on June 18, 1943;

Whereas his son, Air Force Chaplain Solomon Rosen, also died in service of his faith and his country on November 2, 1948;

Whereas Army Chaplain Rabbi Nachman Arnoff died in service of his faith and his country on May 9, 1946;

Whereas Army Chaplain Rabbi Frank Goldenberg died in service of his faith and his country on May 22, 1946;

Whereas Army Chaplain Rabbi Henry Goody died in service of his faith and his country on October 19, 1943;

Whereas Army Chaplain Rabbi Samuel Hurwitz died in service of his faith and his country December 9, 1943;

Whereas Air Force Chaplain Rabbi Samuel Rosen died in service of his faith and his country on May 13, 1955;

Whereas Air Force Chaplain Rabbi David Sobel died in service of his faith and his country on March 7, 1974;

Whereas Chaplains Hill in Arlington National Cemetery memorializes the names of 242 chaplains who perished while on active duty in the Armed Forces of the United States; and

Whereas none of the 14 Jewish chaplains who have died while on active duty are memorialized on Chaplains Hill: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the House of Representatives (the Senate concurring), That it is the sense of Congress that an appropriate site on Chaplains Hill in Arlington National Cemetery should be provided for a memorial marker, to be paid for with private funds, to honor the memory of the Jewish chaplains who died while on active duty in the Armed Forces of the United States, so long as the Secretary of the Army has exclusive authority to approve the design and site of the memorial marker.