Summary: H.Con.Res.336 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (12/22/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Declares that when the House adjourns on any legislative day from Friday, December 17, 2010, through Friday, December 24, 2010, it stand adjourned sine die.

Declares that when the Senate adjourns on any day from Sunday, December 19, 2010, through 11:59 a.m. on Monday, January 3, 2011, it stand adjourned sine die.