Refine your search

5 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
05/12/2009 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
05/12/2009 Senate Committee on Rules and Administration discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5394)
03/11/2009 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 417 - 0 (Roll no. 118).(text: CR 3/10/2009 H3122)
03/10/2009 Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 111-33.
02/04/2009 Introduced in House