Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 02/11/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/11/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 02/11/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/25/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 02/25/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/25/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/25/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/26/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/09/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/09/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/09/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/09/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/09/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/09/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/09/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/18/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/18/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/02/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/02/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/27/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/06/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/12/2009