There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing the 30th anniversary of the Taiwan Relations Act.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
03/24/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3777)
02/23/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
03/26/2009SenateReceived in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
03/24/2009-2:53pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/24/2009-2:53pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3777)
03/24/2009-2:35pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 55.
03/24/2009-2:35pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3777-3780)
03/24/2009-2:35pmHouseMr. Berman moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
03/19/2009HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific, and the Global Environment
03/19/2009HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific, and the Global Environment
02/23/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
02/23/2009HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific, and the Global Environment.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
02/23/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (124)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/25/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/25/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/25/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/25/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/25/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/25/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 02/25/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/25/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/25/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 02/25/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/25/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/26/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/26/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/26/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/26/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/26/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/26/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/26/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/26/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/02/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/02/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/02/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/02/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/02/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/02/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/02/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 03/02/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/02/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/02/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/02/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 03/03/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/03/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/03/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/03/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/03/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 03/03/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/03/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/03/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/03/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/03/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/03/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/03/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/04/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/04/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 03/04/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/04/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/04/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/04/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/04/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/05/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/05/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/05/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/05/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/05/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/05/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/05/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/05/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/09/2009
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/09/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/09/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/09/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/09/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/09/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/09/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/10/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/10/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/10/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/10/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/10/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/12/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/12/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/12/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/12/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/12/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/12/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/12/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/12/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/12/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/12/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/12/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/12/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 03/12/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/12/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/16/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/16/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/16/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 03/16/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/16/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/16/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/16/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/16/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/17/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/17/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/17/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/17/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/18/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/18/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/18/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/19/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/23/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 03/23/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/24/2009

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs02/23/2009 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific, and the Global Environment02/23/2009 Referred to
03/19/2009 Markup by
03/19/2009 Reported by
Senate Foreign Relations03/26/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.55.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Con.Res.55. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (03/24/2009)

Reaffirms the commitment of the House of Representatives to the Taiwan Relations Act as the cornerstone of U.S.-Taiwan relations.

Supports the strong and deepening U.S.-Taiwan relationship.