Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/02/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/04/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/09/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/16/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 03/17/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/20/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/20/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/04/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/08/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 06/09/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/10/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/15/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/15/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/18/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/18/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/18/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/18/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/18/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/18/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 06/18/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/18/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/18/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/18/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/18/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/18/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/18/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/18/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/18/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/18/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/18/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/18/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/09/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/29/2009