Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/04/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/04/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/04/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/05/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/05/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/05/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/09/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/11/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/12/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/12/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/12/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/12/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/12/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/12/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/12/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/12/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/12/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/12/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/12/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/12/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/12/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/16/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/17/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/17/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/17/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/17/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/18/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/18/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 03/18/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/18/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/18/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/19/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/19/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/19/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 03/19/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/19/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/19/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/19/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/19/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/19/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/19/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 03/19/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 03/19/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/19/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/19/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 03/19/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/19/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/19/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/19/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/19/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/23/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/23/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/23/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/23/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/23/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/23/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/23/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/23/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/23/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/23/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/23/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/23/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/23/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/23/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 03/23/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/23/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/23/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/23/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/23/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/23/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/23/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/23/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/23/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/23/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/23/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/23/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/23/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/24/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/24/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/24/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 03/24/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/24/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/24/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/24/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/24/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/24/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/24/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/24/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 03/24/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/24/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 03/24/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/24/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/24/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/24/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 03/24/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/24/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/24/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/24/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/24/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/24/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/24/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/24/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/24/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/24/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/24/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 03/24/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/25/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 03/25/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/25/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/25/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/25/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/25/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 03/26/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/26/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/30/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/30/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/30/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 03/30/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/30/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/30/2009