Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/30/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/30/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/30/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/09/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/21/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/28/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/28/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/28/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/28/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/28/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/28/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/03/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/03/2009