Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/16/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/23/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/26/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/30/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/21/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/21/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/22/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/02/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/02/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/15/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/18/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/23/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/23/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/25/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/25/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/25/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/07/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/08/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/09/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/09/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/09/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/14/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/14/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/14/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/15/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/17/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/20/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/20/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/20/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 07/20/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 07/20/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/21/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/21/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/22/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/22/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/22/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/23/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/24/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/28/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/28/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/28/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/28/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/29/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/29/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/10/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/23/2009