Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/30/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/30/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/30/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 04/30/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/30/2009
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 04/30/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/30/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 04/30/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/30/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/30/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/30/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/30/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/30/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/30/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/30/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/30/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/30/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 04/30/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/30/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/30/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 04/30/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/30/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/30/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 04/30/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/30/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/30/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/30/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/30/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 04/30/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/30/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 04/30/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/30/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/30/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/30/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/30/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/04/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/04/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 05/04/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/04/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/04/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/04/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/04/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/06/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/07/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/12/2009