Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/01/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/01/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/02/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/18/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/26/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/14/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/14/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/14/2010