Summary: H.Con.Res.93 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (04/03/2009)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Declares that, when the House adjourns on any legislative day from Thursday, April 2, 2009, through Saturday, April 4, 2009, it stand adjourned until 2 p.m. on Tuesday, April 21, 2009.

Declares that, when the Senate recesses or adjourns on any day from Thursday, April 2, 2009, through Sunday, April 5, 2009, it stand recessed or adjourned until noon on Monday, April 20, 2009.