Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 06/03/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/07/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/07/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/07/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/07/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/07/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/07/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/07/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/07/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/07/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/07/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/07/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/07/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/07/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/07/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/07/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/07/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/07/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/07/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/07/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/07/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/07/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 07/07/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 07/07/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/07/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/15/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/15/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/20/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/21/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/29/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/29/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/09/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/26/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/13/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/13/2010