Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 04/27/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/27/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/08/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 02/03/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/22/2010