Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/02/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/21/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/21/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/21/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/20/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/20/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/23/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/08/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/16/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/17/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/29/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/18/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/18/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/03/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 01/27/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 03/10/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/18/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/22/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/14/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/14/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/14/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/21/2010