Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 01/06/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/06/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 01/14/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 01/14/2009
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 01/28/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/13/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 02/13/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 03/24/2010