Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/15/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/27/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/27/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/27/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/28/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/28/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/28/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/28/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/28/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/28/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/28/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 01/28/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 01/28/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/28/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/03/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/03/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/03/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/03/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 02/03/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/03/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/03/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/03/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/03/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/03/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/03/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/03/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/03/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/03/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/04/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/04/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 02/11/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/11/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/11/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/11/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/11/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/11/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/11/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/11/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/11/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/24/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/24/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/24/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/24/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/24/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/24/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/24/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/24/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/24/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/24/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/24/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/24/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/24/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/10/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/10/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/10/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 03/10/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/10/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/25/2009