Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/02/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/02/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/02/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/02/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/02/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/02/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 03/02/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/02/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/02/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/02/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/02/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 03/02/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/02/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/02/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 03/02/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 03/02/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/02/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 03/02/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/02/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 03/02/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 03/02/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 03/02/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/03/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/03/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/03/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/05/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/16/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/19/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/01/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/09/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/23/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/27/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/10/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/24/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/01/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 10/06/2009