There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Relating to the disapproval of obligations under the Emergency Economic Stabilization Act of 2008.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
01/22/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 270 - 155 (Roll no. 27).(text: CR H447)
01/06/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber
01/26/2009SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
01/22/2009-1:22pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/22/2009-1:22pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 270 - 155 (Roll no. 27). (text: CR H447)
01/22/2009-12:53pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the statute. (consideration: CR H467)
01/22/2009-10:23amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with two hours of debate on H.J. Res. 3.
01/22/2009-10:23amHouseConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H447-468)
01/06/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
01/06/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/06/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 01/09/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 01/09/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/13/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/13/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 01/13/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 01/13/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/13/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 01/13/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/13/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/13/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 01/13/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/13/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/13/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/13/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 01/13/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 01/13/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/13/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/13/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 01/13/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/13/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 01/13/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/13/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/15/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/15/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/15/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 01/21/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 01/22/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 01/22/2009

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services01/06/2009 Referred to
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs01/26/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.J.Res.3. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (01/22/2009)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Disapproves the obligation of any amount to purchase troubled assets under the Emergency Economic Stabilization Act of 2008 exceeding those already obligated (namely, $250 billion, or upon presidential certification, $350 billion).