Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/04/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/12/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/12/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/12/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/08/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/09/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/26/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/08/2010