There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Native American Heritage Day Act of 2009

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Native American Heritage Day Act of 2009

Short Titles as Introduced

Native American Heritage Day Act of 2009

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Native American Heritage Day Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To honor the achievements and contributions of Native Americans to the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
06/26/2009Became Public Law No: 111-33. (TXT | PDF)
06/26/2009Signed by President.
06/16/2009Presented to President.
06/09/2009Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6389)
06/02/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 385 - 0 (Roll no. 293).(text: CR H6025-6026)
03/12/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/26/2009Became Public Law No: 111-33. (TXT | PDF)
06/26/2009Signed by President.
06/16/2009HousePresented to President.
06/10/2009SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/09/2009SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6389)
06/03/2009SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
06/02/2009-7:12pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/02/2009-7:12pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 385 - 0 (Roll no. 293). (text: CR H6025-6026)
06/02/2009-7:06pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6050)
06/02/2009-3:03pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/02/2009-2:51pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.J. Res. 40.
06/02/2009-2:51pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6025-6028)
06/02/2009-2:51pmHouseMrs. Christensen moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution, as amended.
03/12/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
03/12/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources03/12/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.J.Res.40. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-33 (06/26/2009)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on June 2, 2009. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Native American Heritage Day Act of 2009 - Makes specified findings, including that the Friday immediately succeeding Thanksgiving Day of each year would be an appropriate day to designate as Native American Heritage Day.

Encourages the people of the United States, as well as federal, state, and local governments and interested groups and organizations, to honor Native Americans with appropriate activities to observe Native American Heritage Day, including regarding: (1) the historical status of Native American tribal governments and the present day status of Native Americans; (2) Native American cultures, traditions, and languages; and (3) the rich Native American cultural legacy that all Americans enjoy today.