Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/25/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 03/25/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/25/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/30/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/30/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/01/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/02/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/02/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/21/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/27/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/29/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 08/10/2010