Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 05/05/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/05/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/14/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/14/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/19/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/19/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/19/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/19/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/19/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 05/19/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/19/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/20/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/20/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/21/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/02/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/02/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/02/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/02/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 06/02/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/02/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/02/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/02/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/04/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/04/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/04/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/04/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/09/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/09/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/11/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/11/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/11/2009
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/11/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/11/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/16/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/16/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/24/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/26/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/26/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/07/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 07/07/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/08/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/08/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/09/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/14/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 07/14/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/14/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/28/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/29/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/29/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/14/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/14/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/14/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/17/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/22/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 09/22/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/29/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/29/2009
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/20/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/06/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 11/16/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 12/09/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 12/09/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/28/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/14/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 06/14/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/20/2010