Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-42 (07/28/2009)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on July 21, 2009. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Title I: Approving the Renewal of Import Restrictions Contained in the Burmese Freedom and Democracy Act of 2003 - (Sec. 101) Amends the Burmese Freedom and Democracy Act of 2003 to renew, for three years, the President's authority to ban the import of Burmese products.

(Sec. 102) Approves the renewal of certain import restrictions contained in the Act.

Deems this resolution a renewal resolution.

(Sec. 103) Amends the Consolidated Omnibus Budget Reconciliation Act of 1985 to extend from January 31, 2018, through February 7, 2018, certain customs fees for the processing of merchandise entered into the United States.

(Sec. 104) States that this resolution shall take effect upon its enactment or July 26, 2009, whichever occurs first.

Title II: Time for Payment of Corporate Estimated Taxes - Corporate Estimated Tax Shift Act of 2009 - (Sec. 202) Makes inapplicable to any installment of corporate estimated tax otherwise due after December 31, 2009, the percentages of estimated tax liability of corporations with at least $1 billion in assets required by the Tax Increase Prevention and Reconciliation Act of 2005 for the third quarters of 2010 through 2013.

Increases the estimated tax payments of such corporations in the third quarter of 2014 by .25%, and reduces the fourth quarter installment to reflect such increase.