Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 07/21/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 07/21/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 07/21/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/21/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/24/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/31/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/31/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/31/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/08/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/08/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 09/08/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/16/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/13/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/13/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/13/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/29/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/02/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/08/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 12/15/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/20/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/22/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/03/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/29/2010
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/06/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/18/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/18/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 06/24/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 06/30/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/14/2010