Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 02/26/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 02/26/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/02/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/02/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/02/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/02/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 03/02/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/03/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/03/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/03/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/03/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/03/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/03/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/03/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/03/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/04/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/04/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/04/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/04/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/04/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/04/2010
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/09/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/09/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/09/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/09/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 03/09/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/16/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/16/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 03/16/2010
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 03/16/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 03/18/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/18/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/19/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/19/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/21/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/13/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 04/15/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 05/06/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/26/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/26/2010
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/27/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/22/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/14/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew