There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing and honoring the Blinded Veterans Association on its 65th anniversary of representing blinded veterans and their families.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
04/07/2010Became Public Law No: 111-156. (TXT | PDF)
04/07/2010Signed by President.
04/01/2010Presented to President.
03/26/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2166)
03/23/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 416 - 0 (Roll no. 174).(text: CR 3/22/2010 H2182)
03/04/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
04/07/2010Became Public Law No: 111-156. (TXT | PDF)
04/07/2010Signed by President.
04/01/2010HousePresented to President.
03/26/2010SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2166)
03/24/2010SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
03/23/2010-2:50pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 416 - 0 (Roll no. 174). (text: CR 3/22/2010 H2182)
03/23/2010-2:43pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2228-2229)
03/22/2010-2:51pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Filner objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
03/22/2010-2:42pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.J. Res. 80.
03/22/2010-2:42pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2182-2184)
03/22/2010-2:42pmHouseMr. Filner moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution.
03/04/2010HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
03/04/2010HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs03/04/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.J.Res.80.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.J.Res.80. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-156 (04/07/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Expresses appreciation for the efforts of the Blinded Veterans Association in improving rehabilitation services, education, and benefits for blinded veterans.

Supports the goals and ideals of Blinded Veterans Day, and calls upon the people of the United States to observe such Day.