Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/14/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/14/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/14/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/14/2010
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/14/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/14/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 04/14/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/14/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/14/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/14/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/14/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/14/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/14/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/14/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/14/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/14/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/14/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/14/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/14/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/28/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/28/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 04/28/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/14/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/14/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/14/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/14/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/30/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/30/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/26/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/26/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/26/2010