Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-210 (07/27/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on July 14, 2010. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Approves the renewal of certain import restrictions contained in the Burmese Freedom and Democracy Act of 2003, and deems this resolution a renewal resolution under such Act.

Amends the Consolidated Omnibus Budget Reconciliation Act of 1985 to extend from August 17, 2018, through August 24, 2018, certain customs user fees, including those for certain commercial or private vessels, commercial trucks, railroad cars, commercial or private aircraft, barges or other bulk carriers from Canada or Mexico, dutiable mail, and customs broker permits.

Amends the Hiring Incentives to Restore Employment Act to increase required estimated tax payments of corporations with at least $1 billion in assets in the third quarter of 2015 by 0.25% to 121.75% of such amount.

Declares that the budgetary effects of this Act, for the purpose of complying with the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010, shall be determined by reference to "Budgetary Effects of PAYGO Legislation" for this Act, provided that such statement has been submitted before the vote on passage.

States that this resolution shall take effect upon its enactment or July 26, 2010, whichever occurs first.