Text: H.J.Res.83 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-210 (07/27/2010)

 
[111th Congress Public Law 210]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]



[[Page 124 STAT. 2256]]

Public Law 111-210
111th Congress

                            Joint Resolution


 
 Approving the renewal of import restrictions contained in the Burmese 
Freedom and Democracy Act of 2003, and for other purposes. <<NOTE: July 
                      27, 2010 -  [H.J. Res. 83]>> 

    Resolved by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United 
States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. <<NOTE: 50 USC 1701 note.>> RENEWAL OF IMPORT RESTRICTIONS 
            UNDER BURMESE FREEDOM AND DEMOCRACY ACT OF 2003.

    (a) In General.--Congress approves the renewal of the import 
restrictions contained in section 3(a)(1) and section 3A (b)(1) and 
(c)(1) of the Burmese Freedom and Democracy Act of 2003.
    (b) Rule of Construction.--This joint resolution shall be deemed to 
be a ``renewal resolution'' for purposes of section 9 of the Burmese 
Freedom and Democracy Act of 2003.

SEC. 2. CUSTOMS USER FEES.

    Section 13031(j)(3)(B)(i) of the Consolidated Omnibus Budget 
Reconciliation Act of 1985 (19 U.S.C. 58c(j)(3)(B)(i)) is amended by 
striking ``August 17, 2018'' and inserting ``August 24, 2018''.

SEC. 3. <<NOTE: 26 USC 6655 note.>> TIME FOR PAYMENT OF CORPORATE 
            ESTIMATED TAXES.

    The percentage under paragraph (2) of section 561 of the Hiring 
Incentives to Restore Employment Act in effect on the date of the 
enactment of this Act is increased by 0.25 percentage points.

SEC. 4. PAYGO COMPLIANCE.

    The budgetary effects of this Act, for the purpose of complying with 
the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010, shall be determined by 
reference to the latest statement titled ``Budgetary Effects of PAYGO 
Legislation'' for this Act, submitted for printing in the Congressional 
Record by the Chairman of the House Budget Committee, provided that such 
statement has been submitted prior to the vote on passage.

[[Page 124 STAT. 2257]]

SEC. 5. <<NOTE: 19 USC 58c note.>> EFFECTIVE DATE.

    This joint resolution and the amendments made by this joint 
resolution shall take effect on the date of the enactment of this joint 
resolution or July 26, 2010, whichever occurs earlier.

    Approved July 27, 2010.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.J. Res. 83:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 156 (2010):
            July 14, considered and passed House.
            July 22, considered and passed Senate.

                                  <all>