Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/25/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 05/25/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/25/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/27/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/27/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/27/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/27/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/27/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/27/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/27/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/27/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 05/27/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/27/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/27/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/27/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 05/27/2010
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/27/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/27/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/27/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/27/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/27/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/27/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/27/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/27/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/27/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/27/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/27/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/27/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 05/27/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/28/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/28/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/28/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/08/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/08/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/08/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/08/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/08/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/08/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/08/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/08/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/08/2010
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/08/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/08/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/08/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/08/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/08/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 06/15/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/15/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/15/2010
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 06/15/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 06/15/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/15/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/15/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/15/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/15/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/15/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/15/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/15/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 06/15/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/15/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/15/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/15/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/15/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 06/15/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/15/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 06/15/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 06/15/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/17/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/17/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/17/2010
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/17/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/17/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/17/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/17/2010