Text: H.J.Res.86 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Referred in Senate (06/18/2010)


111th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. J. RES. 86

IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES
June 18, 2010

Received; read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations


JOINT RESOLUTION

Recognizing the 60th anniversary of the outbreak of the Korean War and reaffirming the United States-Korea alliance.

Whereas, on June 25, 1950, communist North Korea invaded the Republic of Korea with approximately 135,000 troops, thereby initiating the Korean War;

Whereas, on June 27, 1950, President Harry Truman ordered the United States Armed Forces to help the Republic of Korea defend itself against the North Korean invasion;

Whereas United States and Allied forces recaptured the capital city of Seoul on September 28, 1950, after a successful amphibious landing by the Marine Corps at Inchon on September 15, 1950;

Whereas the hostilities ended in a cease-fire marked by the signing of the armistice at Panmunjom on July 27, 1953, and the peninsula still technically remains in a state of war;

Whereas, during the Korean War, approximately 1,789,000 members of the United States Armed Forces served in-theater along with the forces of the Republic of Korea and 20 other members of the United Nations to defend freedom and democracy;

Whereas casualties of the United States during the Korean War included 54,246 dead (of whom 33,739 were battle deaths), more than 92,100 wounded, and approximately 8,176 listed as missing in action or prisoners of war;

Whereas approximately 6,800,000 American men and women served worldwide in the Armed Forces during the entire Korean War era of June 27, 1950, to January 31, 1955;

Whereas the Korean War Veterans Recognition Act (Public Law 111–41) was enacted on July 27, 2009, so that the honorable service and noble sacrifice by members of the United States Armed Forces in the Korean War will never be forgotten;

Whereas President Barack Obama issued a proclamation to designate July 27, 2009, as the National Korean War Veterans Armistice Day and called upon Americans to display flags at half-staff in memory of the Korean War veterans;

Whereas since 1975, the Republic of Korea has invited thousands of American Korean War veterans, including members of the Korean War Veterans Association, to revisit Korea in appreciation for their sacrifices;

Whereas in the 60 years since the outbreak of the Korean War, the Republic of Korea has emerged from a war-torn economy into one of the major economies in the world and one of the largest trading partners of the United States;

Whereas the Republic of Korea is among the closest allies of the United States, having contributed troops in support of United States operations during the Vietnam war, Gulf war, and operations in Iraq and Afghanistan, while also supporting numerous United Nations peacekeeping missions throughout the world;

Whereas since the end of the Korean War era, more than 28,500 members of the United States Armed Forces have served annually in the United States Forces Korea to defend the Republic of Korea against external aggression, and to promote regional peace;

Whereas North Korea's sinking of the South Korean naval ship, Cheonan, on March 26, 2010, which resulted in the killing of 46 sailors, necessitates a reaffirmation of the United States-Korea alliance in safeguarding the stability of the Korean Peninsula;

Whereas from the ashes of war and the sharing of spilled blood on the battlefield, the United States and the Republic of Korea have continuously stood shoulder-to-shoulder to promote and defend international peace and security, economic prosperity, human rights, and the rule of law both on the Korean Peninsula and beyond; and

Whereas beginning in June 2010, various ceremonies are being planned in the United States and the Republic of Korea to commemorate the 60th anniversary of the outbreak of the Korean War and to honor all Korean War veterans: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, That Congress—

(1) recognizes the historical importance of the 60th anniversary of the outbreak of the Korean War, which began on June 25, 1950;

(2) honors the noble service and sacrifice of the United States Armed Forces and the armed forces of allied countries that served in Korea since 1950 to the present;

(3) encourages all Americans to participate in commemorative activities to pay solemn tribute to, and to never forget, the veterans of the Korean War; and

(4) reaffirms the commitment of the United States to its alliance with the Republic of Korea for the betterment of peace and prosperity on the Korean Peninsula.

Passed the House of Representatives June 17, 2010.

Attest: lorraine c. miller,   
Clerk