There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing the 20th anniversary of the outbreak of the Gulf War and reaffirming the commitment of the United States towards Gulf War veterans.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/22/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
07/22/2010Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
07/22/2010Referred to House Armed Services
Action By: House of Representatives
07/22/2010Referred to House Foreign Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
07/22/2010Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/22/2010Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/27/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/27/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/27/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 07/27/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/27/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/27/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/27/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/28/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 07/28/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 07/28/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/28/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/28/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/28/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/28/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/28/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/15/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/15/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/15/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/15/2010

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs07/22/2010 Referred to
House Armed Services07/22/2010 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs07/22/2010 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.94. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/22/2010)

Recognizes the 20th anniversary of the outbreak of the Gulf War. Honors the service and sacrifice of the armed forces of the United States and of allied countries that served in the Persian Gulf since 1990.

Encourages all Americans to participate in commemorative activities. Calls upon the President to issue a proclamation recognizing that anniversary.

Reaffirms the U.S. commitment to its alliance with Kuwait.