Text: H.J.Res.94 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/22/2010)


111th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. J. RES. 94


Recognizing the 20th anniversary of the outbreak of the Gulf War and reaffirming the commitment of the United States towards Gulf War veterans.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

July 22, 2010

Mr. Michaud (for himself, Mr. Ryan of Ohio, Mr. Critz, Mr. Kratovil, Mr. Inglis, Mr. Rogers of Alabama, Mr. Teague, Mr. Lipinski, Mr. Murphy of New York, Ms. Bordallo, Mr. Filner, Mr. Wilson of South Carolina, Mr. Bartlett, Ms. Shea-Porter, Mr. Taylor, Ms. Pingree of Maine, Ms. Sutton, Mr. Nye, Mr. Kissell, and Ms. Giffords) introduced the following joint resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services and Veterans’ Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned


JOINT RESOLUTION

Recognizing the 20th anniversary of the outbreak of the Gulf War and reaffirming the commitment of the United States towards Gulf War veterans.

    Whereas, on August 2, 1990, Iraq bombed and invaded the Republic of Kuwait, thereby initiating the Gulf War;

    Whereas, on January 12, 1991, the United States Congress authorized the United States Armed Forces to help the Republic of Kuwait defend itself against the Iraqi invasion;

    Whereas United States and Coalition air forces under United States Central Command Air Forces opened Operation Desert Storm with an air campaign on January 17, 1991, that eventually flew over 100,000 sorties and delivered over 88,000 tons of largely precision munitions against enemy infrastructure;

    Whereas, on January 31, 1991, the United States Marine Corps drove back Iraqi forces in the city of Khafji, in Saudi Arabia, supported by Saudi and Qatari forces;

    Whereas, on February 23, 1991, the 1st Marine Division, 2nd Marine Division, and the 1st Light Armored Infantry crossed into Kuwait and paved the way for Kuwaiti forces to recapture Kuwait City on February 26, 1991;

    Whereas, on February 24, 1991, operating with allied French and British forces, heavy armored elements of the United States Army VII Corps thrust through enemy defenses west of Kuwait City, and the United States XVIII Airborne Corps, spearheaded by the 3rd Armored Cavalry Regiment and the 24th Infantry Division (Mechanized), executed a rapid flanking maneuver farther west through weakly held Iraqi territory and encircled enemy forces there;

    Whereas the hostilities ended in a cease-fire declared by President George Bush on February 28, 1991, 100 hours after the ground campaign began;

    Whereas during the Gulf War, approximately 694,550 members of the United States Armed Forces served in-theater, along with the forces of the Republic of Kuwait and 30 other member states of the United Nations, to defend freedom and democracy;

    Whereas casualties of the United States during the Gulf War included 383 dead (of whom 148 were battle deaths), and more than 467 wounded;

    Whereas approximately 2,225,000 American men and women served worldwide in the Armed Forces during the entire Gulf War era of August 2, 1990, to February 28, 1991;

    Whereas approximately 174,000 veterans suffer from Gulf War veterans’ illnesses, including Gulf War Syndrome;

    Whereas Congress applauds the Institute of Medicine’s Report on Gulf War and Health, released on April 9, 2010, fully supports the Department of Veterans Affairs task force to identify recommendations from that report to better identify and treat Gulf War veterans’ illnesses, including Gulf War Syndrome, and reaffirms the commitment of the United States to ensure that all Gulf War veterans suffering from these illnesses are appropriately treated and compensated;

    Whereas the Republic of Kuwait is a strong ally of the United States, having contributed troops in support of United States operations during the Gulf War, and providing the main platform of support for operations in Operation Iraqi Freedom, while also supporting numerous United Nations peacekeeping missions throughout the world;

    Whereas since the end of the Gulf War era, an average of more than 2,000 members of the United States Armed Forces have served annually in Kuwait to defend the Republic of Kuwait against external aggression, and to promote regional peace; and

    Whereas beginning in August 2010, various ceremonies are being planned in the United States to commemorate the 20th anniversary of the outbreak of the Gulf War and to honor all Gulf War veterans: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, That Congress—

(1) recognizes the historical importance of the 20th anniversary of the outbreak of the Gulf War, which began on August 2, 1990;

(2) honors the noble service and sacrifice of the United States Armed Forces and the armed forces of allied countries that served in the Persian Gulf since 1990 to the present;

(3) encourages all Americans to participate in commemorative activities to pay solemn tribute to, and to never forget, the veterans of the Gulf War;

(4) calls upon the President to issue a proclamation recognizing the 20th anniversary of the Gulf War; and

(5) reaffirms the commitment of the United States to its alliance with the Republic of Kuwait for the betterment of peace and prosperity in the Persian Gulf region.