There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Making full-year continuing appropriations for fiscal year 2011 at lower, previous year levels, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/22/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
09/22/2010Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/22/2010Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (77)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 09/22/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 09/22/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/23/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/23/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/23/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/23/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/23/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/23/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 09/23/2010
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 09/23/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 09/23/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/23/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/23/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/23/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/23/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/23/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/23/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 09/23/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/23/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/23/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/23/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/29/2010
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 09/29/2010
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/29/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/29/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 09/29/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 09/29/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/29/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/29/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/29/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 09/29/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/18/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/18/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/18/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 11/18/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/18/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/18/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/02/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 12/02/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 12/02/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 12/21/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Appropriations09/22/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.J.Res.96.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.96. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/22/2010)

Makes continuing appropriations for FY2011.

Appropriates amounts for continuing projects or activities which were conducted in FY2008-FY2010 and for which appropriations, funds, or other authority were made available in section 101 of division A of P.L. 110-329 (Consolidated Security, Disaster Assistance, and Continuing Appropriations Act, 2009) in specified FY2008 appropriations Acts.

Provides that, if the amount provided for a project or activity would be higher than the amount provided in appropriation Acts for FY2010, such project or activity shall be funded at the lower amount.

Enacts into law: (1) the Department of Defense Appropriations Act, 2011, as reported in the 111th Congress by the Subcommittee on Defense of the House Committee on Appropriations; (2) the Department of Homeland Security Appropriations Act, 2011, as reported in the 111th Congress by the Subcommittee on Homeland Security of the House Committee on Appropriations; and (3) the Military Construction and Veterans Affairs and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2011, as passed in the 111th Congress by the House.

Makes appropriations, funds, and authority granted pursuant to this joint resolution available through FY2011, unless otherwise provided for in the applicable appropriations Act.

Authorizes continuation of other specified activities (including activities for entitlements and other mandatory payments) through such date.

Prohibits the use of funds made available in this joint resolution: (1) to carry out any program under, promulgate any regulation pursuant to, or defend against any lawsuit challenging any provision of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act, the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010, or any amendment made by either Act; or (2) for a congressional earmark.