Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 09/22/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 09/22/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/23/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/23/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/23/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/23/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/23/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/23/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 09/23/2010
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 09/23/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 09/23/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/23/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/23/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/23/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/23/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/23/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/23/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 09/23/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/23/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/23/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/23/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/29/2010
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 09/29/2010
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/29/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/29/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 09/29/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 09/29/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/29/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/29/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/29/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 09/29/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/18/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/18/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/18/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 11/18/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/18/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/18/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/02/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 12/02/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 12/02/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 12/21/2010