Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 09/23/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/29/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/29/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/29/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/29/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/29/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 09/29/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/29/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/29/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/29/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/29/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/29/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/29/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/29/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/29/2010
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/29/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 09/29/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 11/17/2010
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 12/02/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 12/07/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 12/15/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/16/2010