Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 01/12/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 01/12/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 01/12/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/12/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 01/12/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2]* 01/12/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/12/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 01/12/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 01/12/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 01/12/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/12/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 01/12/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 01/12/2010
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 01/12/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 01/13/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/13/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/13/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 01/13/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 01/13/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/13/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/13/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/13/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/13/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/13/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 01/13/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/19/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 01/19/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/19/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/19/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 01/19/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/19/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/19/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 01/19/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/19/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/19/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 01/19/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 01/19/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/20/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 01/20/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 01/20/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/20/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/20/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 01/20/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/20/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/20/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 01/20/2010
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 01/20/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 01/20/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 01/20/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 01/20/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/20/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 01/20/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 01/20/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 01/20/2010
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 01/20/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/20/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/20/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/20/2010
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 01/20/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 01/20/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 01/20/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 01/20/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 01/20/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/20/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/20/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 01/20/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/20/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/20/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 01/20/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 01/20/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/20/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/20/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 01/20/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/20/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 01/20/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 01/20/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/20/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 01/20/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/20/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/20/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/21/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/21/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/21/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 01/21/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 01/21/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/21/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/21/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 01/21/2010
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 01/21/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 01/26/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 01/26/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/26/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 01/26/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 01/26/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 01/26/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/26/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 01/26/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 01/26/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/26/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/26/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/26/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/26/2010