Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 01/19/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 01/19/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 01/19/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 01/20/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/20/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 01/22/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/22/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 01/26/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/26/2010