Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 01/19/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/20/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 01/20/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/22/2010
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 01/22/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 01/26/2010