Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/03/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/03/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/03/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/03/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/03/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/23/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/03/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/16/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/16/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/22/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/22/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/28/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/30/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/30/2010