Text: H.Res.1022 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Engrossed in House (02/04/2010)

 
[Congressional Bills 111th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Res. 1022 Engrossed in House (EH)]

H. Res. 1022

                In the House of Representatives, U. S.,

                                                      February 4, 2010.
Whereas Medgar Evers was born on July 2, 1925, in Decatur, Mississippi;
Whereas Mr. Evers was hired by Dr. Theodore Roosevelt Mason Howard to sell 
        insurance for the Magnolia Mutual Life Insurance Company;
Whereas Mr. Evers was inducted into United States Army in 1943 and fought in the 
        Battle of Normandy;
Whereas Dr. Howard, as President of the Regional Council of Negro Leadership, 
        helped to introduce Mr. Evers to civil rights activism;
Whereas Mr. Evers applied to the then-segregated University of Mississippi 
        School of Law in February 1954;
Whereas Mr. Evers' application was rejected resulting in a National Association 
        for the Advancement of Colored People (NAACP) campaign to desegregate 
        the school;
Whereas Mr. Evers was hired as a field secretary for the NAACP;
Whereas Mr. Evers was the target of a number of death threats as a result of his 
        activism;
Whereas, on May 28, 1963, a Molotov cocktail was thrown into the carport of Mr. 
        Evers's home and 5 days before his death Mr. Evers was assaulted by a 
        car outside of an NAACP office;
Whereas Mr. Evers was assassinated in the driveway of his home in Jackson after 
        returning from a meeting with NAACP lawyers on June 12, 1963;
Whereas this assassination occurred just hours after President John F. Kennedy's 
        speech on national television in support of civil rights;
Whereas the death of Mr. Evers helped to prompt President John F. Kennedy to ask 
        Congress for a comprehensive civil rights bill;
Whereas that bill, the Civil Rights Act of 1964, was signed into law by 
        President Lyndon Johnson;
Whereas Mr. Evers' assassination has been memorialized in numerous popular 
        songs, movies, and written pieces;
Whereas in 1969, Medgar Evers College was established in Brooklyn, New York, as 
        part of the City University of New York;
Whereas, on June 28, 1992, the city of Jackson, Mississippi erected a statue in 
        honor of Mr. Evers;
Whereas in December 2004, the Jackson City Council changed the name of the 
        city's airport to Jackson-Evers International Airport; and
Whereas, on October 9, 2009, Secretary of the Navy Ray Mabus announced that the 
        United States Naval Ship (USNS) Medgar Evers (T-AKE-13), a Lewis and 
        Clark-class dry cargo ship, will be named after Mr. Evers: Now, 
        therefore, be it
    Resolved, That the House of Representatives--
            (1) honors the life and sacrifice of Medgar Evers;
            (2) recognizes the important role Mr. Evers played in securing civil 
        rights for all people in the United States; and
            (3) congratulates the United States Navy for honoring Medgar Evers 
        by naming the United States Naval Ship Medgar Evers after him.
            Attest:

                                                                          Clerk.

Share This