Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 01/21/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 01/21/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 01/27/2010
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 01/27/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 01/27/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/27/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 01/27/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 01/27/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 01/27/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 01/27/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 01/27/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 01/27/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 01/27/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/27/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/27/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 01/27/2010
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 01/27/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/27/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/03/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/03/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/03/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/03/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/03/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/03/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/04/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/04/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/04/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/04/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/04/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/22/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/22/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/22/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/22/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/22/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/02/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/02/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/04/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/16/2010
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 04/21/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/21/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/26/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/13/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/30/2010