Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 01/21/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/21/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 01/26/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 01/26/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/26/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/26/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 01/26/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 01/26/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 01/26/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 01/26/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 01/26/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 01/26/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/26/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/26/2010
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 02/03/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/03/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/03/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/03/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 02/03/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/03/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 02/03/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 02/03/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/03/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/03/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/03/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 02/03/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/03/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 02/03/2010
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/03/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/03/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/03/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/03/2010
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 02/03/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 02/23/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/23/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/23/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/23/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/23/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/04/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/04/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/04/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/04/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/16/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/16/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 03/16/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/16/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/16/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/22/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/22/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/22/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 03/22/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/25/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/25/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 03/25/2010
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/25/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/25/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/25/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/13/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/13/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/13/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 04/13/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/15/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/15/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/15/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/15/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/15/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/21/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/21/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/21/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 04/21/2010
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/21/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/21/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/21/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 04/21/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/21/2010
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/21/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/21/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/21/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 04/21/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/21/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/21/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/21/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/21/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/21/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/21/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/22/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/22/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/22/2010
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/22/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/27/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/27/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/27/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/27/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/27/2010