Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/02/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 02/02/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/02/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/02/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 02/02/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/02/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/02/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 02/02/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 02/02/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 02/02/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/02/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/02/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/02/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/02/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 02/02/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/02/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/02/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/02/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/02/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/02/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 02/02/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/02/2010
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/02/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/02/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/02/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/03/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/03/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/03/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/03/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/03/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/03/2010
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/03/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 02/03/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/03/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 02/03/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/03/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/03/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/03/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/03/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/03/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/03/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/03/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/03/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 02/04/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/15/2010